LA SB341 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 7/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Effective date 7/1/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative for the Major Events Incentive Fund and Program and the Events Incentive Fund and Program. (gov sig) (EN -$500,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative for the Major Events Incentive Fund and Program and the Events Incentive Fund and Program. (gov sig) (EN -$500,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 341 CONCUR (#1221) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#1355) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#603) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-23 - House - House Vote on SB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#1355) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 341 FINAL PASSAGE (#603) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2024. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 518. |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-05-23 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-05-22 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-05-20 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-05-13 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-05-09 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |