LA SB339 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the closure of a restaurant at a qualified truck stop facility. (8/1/16)
Title
Provides with respect to the closure of a restaurant at a qualified truck stop facility. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |