LA SB338 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-11)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health coverage plans to include alternative imaging methods to mammography. (gov sig)
Title
Requires health coverage plans to include alternative imaging methods to mammography. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 338 CO-AUTHORS (#72) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 338 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 338 FINAL PASSAGE (#71) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |