LA SB311 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-30 - Effective date 6/30/10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to campaign contributions and expenditures by individuals. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to campaign contributions and expenditures by individuals. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Vote on SB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#1685) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Vote on SB 311, FINAL PASSAGE (#454) (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Effective date 6/30/10. | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 778. | |
2010-06-20 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2010-06-18 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-18 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-17 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2010-06-17 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-11 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/17/2010. | |
2010-06-10 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2010-06-09 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2010-06-08 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-05-04 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2010-05-03 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2010-04-29 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage. | |
2010-04-28 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-03-29 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | |
2010-03-18 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |