LA SB29 | 2020 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-12 - Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for legislative review of a state of emergency issued by the governor that extends beyond thirty days. (gov sig) (Items #1 and #2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for legislative review of a state of emergency issued by the governor that extends beyond thirty days. (gov sig) (Items #1 and #2)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 29 REJECT (#36) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on SB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#30) (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on SB 29 AMENDMENT # 237 BY FRIEMAN MOTION TO ADOPT (#29) (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - House - House Vote on SB 29 AMENDMENT # 216 BY MCFARLAND MOTION TO ADOPT (#28) (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-09-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#13) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-12SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2020-10-12HouseHouse conferees appointed: Dwight, Schexnayder, and McFarland.
2020-10-12HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2020-10-07SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, McMath, and Smith.
2020-10-06HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2020-10-06SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
2020-10-05SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2020-10-02HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 65, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2020-10-01HouseScheduled for floor debate on 10/02/20.
2020-10-01HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2020-10-01HouseRules suspended.
2020-10-01HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2020-10-01HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2020-09-30HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2020-09-30SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2020-09-29SenateReported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2020-09-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=202ES&b=SB29&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189360
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189642
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190035
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189674
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189994
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189898
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190110
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190122
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190338
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190405
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190467
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190426
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190525
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190508
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190609
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189362
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1189682
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190070
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190015
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1190528
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1191066

Bill Comments

feedback