LA SB277 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners. (8/1/18)
Title
Provides relative to the Louisiana State Board of Medical Examiners. (8/1/18)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 277 REJECT (#1376) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#1294) (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 277 AMENDMENT # 4329 BY JACKSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#1293) (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#938) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#1294) (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House Vote on SB 277 AMENDMENT # 4329 BY JACKSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#1293) (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#938) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 277 FINAL PASSAGE (#340) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. |
2018-05-18 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, Boudreaux, and Mills. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2018-05-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 31. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18. |
2018-05-16 | House | Notice given. |
2018-05-11 | House | Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules. |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider called from the table. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-04-27 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2018-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-11 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |