LA SB262 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-04 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to powers of the governor during times of a disaster or emergency. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to powers of the governor during times of a disaster or emergency. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Gatti [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |