LA SB262 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-12 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to qualifications of applicants for alcoholic beverage permits. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to qualifications of applicants for alcoholic beverage permits. (8/1/12) (EN NO IMPACT GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 262, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1587) (Y: 64 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 262, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1577) (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, ADOPT (#1756) (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, REJECT (#567) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - House - House Vote on SB 262, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1577) (Y: 52 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2012-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, ADOPT (#1756) (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, REJECT (#567) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - House - House Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#562) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#141) (Y: 22 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 262, FINAL PASSAGE (#131) (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-12 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-12 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 764. | |
2012-06-12 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/06. | |
2012-06-04 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 06/05. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-04 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2012-06-04 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 64, nays 18. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2012-06-04 | Reconsidered. | |
2012-06-04 | Rules suspended. Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 52, nays 13. The House refused to adopt the Conference Committee Report. Motion to reconsider pending. | |
2012-06-04 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 2 nays. | |
2012-06-04 | Conference Committee report received. | |
2012-05-03 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2012-05-02 | House conferees appointed: Brossett, Arnold, and Kleckley. | |
2012-05-02 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2012-05-02 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Peterson, and Smith, Gary. | |
2012-04-30 | Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments. | |
2012-04-30 | Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2012-04-26 | Received from the House with amendments. | |
2012-04-26 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-04-18 | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/26/2012. | |
2012-04-10 | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-04-09 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-04-05 | Reported with amendments (13-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-04-02 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2012-03-29 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-28 | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 6 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-28 | Reconsidered. | |
2012-03-27 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 19 yeas and 16 nays. | |
2012-03-27 | Called from the Calendar. | |
2012-03-27 | The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | |
2012-03-27 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. | |
2012-03-26 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-21 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2012-02-29 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |