LA SB254 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 6/15/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-6)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective date 6/15/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the Motion Picture Production Tax Credit. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the Motion Picture Production Tax Credit. (gov sig) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 CONCUR (#675) (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#620) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 254 AMENDMENT # 3698 BY PEARSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#619) (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#353) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 AMENDMENT # 2029 BY APPEL SB 254 BY MORRELL (#352) (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#620) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 254 AMENDMENT # 3698 BY PEARSON MOTION TO ADOPT (#619) (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 FINAL PASSAGE (#353) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 254 AMENDMENT # 2029 BY APPEL SB 254 BY MORRELL (#352) (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Senate | Effective date 6/15/2017. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 309. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2017-06-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 8. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-01 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-01 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/17. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Substitute for Senate Bill No. 235. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |