LA SB247 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the regulation of sports wagering. (See Act) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the regulation of sports wagering. (See Act) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 247 CONCUR (#1066) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 247 RECONSIDER (#1065) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 247 REJECT (#980) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 247 FINAL PASSAGE (#994) (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 247 FINAL PASSAGE (#411) (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21SenateEffective date 7/1/2021.
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 440.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10SenateNotice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
2021-06-10HouseDischarged from Conference Committee.
2021-06-10HouseNotice the Senate has discharged the Conference Committee.
2021-06-10SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 3 nays.
2021-06-10SenateBy a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-10SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-10SenateSenate Conference Committee members discharged.
2021-06-10SenateReconsidered.
2021-06-09SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-09HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stefanski, James, and Schexnayder.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-08SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Ward, and Smith.
2021-06-08HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-06SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-03HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 15. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-02HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
2021-05-27HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-26HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-25HouseReported with amendments (8-0). Rules suspended. Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2021-05-20HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-19SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 6 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-19SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2021-05-18SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-17SenateRead by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-13SenateSubstitute for Senate Bill No. 202. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB247&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224156
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224498
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225572
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234538
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235896
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224979
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226342
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226147
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227689
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228023
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228283
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229920
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231609
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1224158
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225394
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225537
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226167
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226622
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227111
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1228803
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232052
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231813
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234835
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235988
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226406
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231682
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233207
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234314
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234315

Bill Comments 750

feedback