LA SB235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes parishes to contract with the Louisiana Sales and Use Tax Commission for Remote Sellers for the collection of local sales and use tax. (1/1/23) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Title
Authorizes parishes to contract with the Louisiana Sales and Use Tax Commission for Remote Sellers for the collection of local sales and use tax. (1/1/23) (EN SEE FISC NOTE LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#1465) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#343) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 235 FINAL PASSAGE (#343) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-06-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 685. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-06-01 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-26 | House | Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-17 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-05-16 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2022-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2022-04-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered re- reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |