LA SB224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for remote operations of the legislature during a gubernatorially declared state of emergency. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for remote operations of the legislature during a gubernatorially declared state of emergency. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 CONCUR (#1344) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1499) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#128) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#1499) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 224 FINAL PASSAGE (#128) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-18 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-04 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |