LA SB223 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Effective date 8/1/2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative the La. Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology. (8/1/16)
Title
Provides relative the La. Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology. (8/1/16)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 CONCUR (#1091) (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#1019) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#1019) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 223 FINAL PASSAGE (#384) (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 8/1/2016. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 478. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2016-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-19 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2016. |
2016-05-13 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2016-04-27 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2016-04-26 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |