LA SB221 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective date 7/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to voting systems. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to voting systems. (gov sig) (EN INCREASE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-10 - House - House Vote on SB 221 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1254) (Y: 69 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 ADOPT (#1138) (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 REJECT (#674) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#899) (Y: 62 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 221 AMENDMENT # 3727 BY HODGES MOTION TO ADOPT (#898) (Y: 28 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-06-01 - House - House Vote on SB 221 AMENDMENT # 3721 BY AMEDEE MOTION TO ADOPT (#897) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CO-AUTHORS (#180) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#179) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01SenateEffective date 7/1/2021.
2021-07-01SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 480.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-10SenateNotice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 69, nays 34. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
2021-06-10HouseNotice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
2021-06-10HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-10SenateConference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays.
2021-06-10HouseConference Committee report received.
2021-06-06SenateNotice House Conference Committee members appointed.
2021-06-03HouseHouse conferees appointed: Stefanski, Duplessis, and Thomas.
2021-06-03HouseNotice of Senate conferees appointed.
2021-06-03SenateSenate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Milligan, and Tarver.
2021-06-03HouseNotice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
2021-06-02SenateAmendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-01SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-01HouseRead third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 39. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-06-01HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-06-01HouseCalled from the calendar.
2021-05-27HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021.
2021-05-27HouseNotice given.
2021-05-27HouseRead by title, returned to the calendar.
2021-05-26HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-20HouseReported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-05-19HouseReported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-03HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-29HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-04-28SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-04-21SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-04-20SenateRules suspended. Reported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB221&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212314
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1215574
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218739
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234679
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236590
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214358
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216227
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217813
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226179
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226176
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226040
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226344
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226610
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229067
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229337
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230259
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230166
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229468
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212319
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1214842
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1216231
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217066
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1217340
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218829
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1219648
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226355
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1227106
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230511
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230729
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234592
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234781
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235030
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1236608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1218708
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230266
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230275
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230278
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230977
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234623
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1234699

Bill Comments 750

feedback