LA SB221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-6)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 6/11/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to abortion and the Woman's Right to Know law. (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to abortion and the Woman's Right to Know law. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CONCUR (#671) (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#749) (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CO-AUTHORS (#107) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#749) (Y: 82 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 CO-AUTHORS (#107) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 221 FINAL PASSAGE (#106) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/11/2019. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 198. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 13. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/19. |
2019-05-23 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-04-24 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |