LA SB215 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-17)
Status: Passed on June 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Effective date 8/1/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides for reasonable accommodations of employees who become temporarily disabled due to certain pregnancy-related medical conditions.(8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for reasonable accommodations of employees who become temporarily disabled due to certain pregnancy-related medical conditions.(8/1/21) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 CONCUR (#993) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#1054) (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#1054) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 CO-AUTHORS (#419) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#418) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateEffective date 8/1/2021.
2021-06-17SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 393.
2021-06-10SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
2021-06-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2021-06-09SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2021-06-08SenateRules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
2021-06-07SenateReceived from the House with amendments.
2021-06-07HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-03HouseScheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
2021-06-03HouseRead by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended.
2021-06-03HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2021-06-03HouseReported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2021-05-25HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-05-24HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2021-05-20SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-05-20SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2021-05-12SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2021-05-11SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2021-05-10SenateReported with amendments.
2021-04-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
2021-04-02SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=21rs&b=SB215&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212264
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222046
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226879
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233567
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235882
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222003
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221499
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1222244
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1225891
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1230465
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231523
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1212267
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1221739
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223463
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1223881
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226976
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1229042
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1231568
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232642
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233062
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235036
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1235907
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226840
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1226841
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1232858
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233038
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=1233434

Bill Comments

feedback