LA SB215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date 7/1/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for ferries on the Mississippi River. (7/1/13) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for ferries on the Mississippi River. (7/1/13) (EN SEE FISC NOTE SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 CONCUR (#969) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#761) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#218) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2013. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 273. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2013. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-29 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-28 | House | Reported favorably (18-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, amended, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-01 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2013-04-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |