LA SB202 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Effective date 8/15/11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Provides relative to the membership, duties and operations of the parole board and pardon board. (8/15/11) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides relative to the membership, duties and operations of the parole board and pardon board. (8/15/11) (EN NO IMPACT See Note)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-15 - House - House Vote on SB 202, FINAL PASSAGE (#662) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 202, FINAL PASSAGE (#184) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-24 Effective date 8/15/11.
2011-06-24 Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 153.
2011-06-19 Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 06/17.
2011-06-16 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2011-06-16 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2011-06-15 Received from the House without amendments.
2011-06-15 Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2011-06-13 Scheduled for floor debate on 6/15/2011.
2011-06-13 Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
2011-06-09 Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2011-06-08 Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2011-05-19 Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2011-05-18 Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules
2011-05-17 Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2011-05-16 Senate floor amendments read and adopted; returned to regular order.
2011-05-11 Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to a third reading and final passage.
2011-05-10 Reported favorably.
2011-04-25 Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the committee on Judiciary B.
2011-04-15 Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the committee on Judiciary B.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback