LA SB193 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Effective date 7/1/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Louisiana Structured Settlement Protection Act. (7/1/20)
Title
Enacts the Louisiana Structured Settlement Protection Act. (7/1/20)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Morrish [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 193 CONCUR (#933) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 193 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 193 FINAL PASSAGE (#365) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-02 - House - House Vote on SB 193 FINAL PASSAGE (#820) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 193 FINAL PASSAGE (#365) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | Senate | Effective date 7/1/2020. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 260. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2019-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2019-06-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/19. |
2019-05-30 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2019-05-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2019-05-16 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |