LA SB181 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals an income tax deduction for the net capital gains on the sale of a nonpublicly traded business commercially domiciled in Louisiana. (gov sig) (EG +$3,700,000 GF RV See Note)
Title
Repeals an income tax deduction for the net capital gains on the sale of a nonpublicly traded business commercially domiciled in Louisiana. (gov sig) (EG +$3,700,000 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |