LA SB168 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Effective date 1/1/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to commercial insurance. (1/1/23)
Title
Provides relative to commercial insurance. (1/1/23)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Vote on SB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#1185) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 168 FINAL PASSAGE (#230) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | Effective date 1/1/2023. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 259. |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/27/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2022-05-25 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-25 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022. |
2022-05-24 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice given. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2022. |
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-04-28 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-04-27 | House | Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-04-18 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-04-13 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |