LA SB160 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to require Senate confirmation for gubernatorially appointed members of the State Civil Service Commission.
Title
Constitutional amendment to require Senate confirmation for gubernatorially appointed members of the State Civil Service Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Cleo Fields [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 CONCUR (#1340) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#1457) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-03 - House - House Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#1457) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 160 FINAL PASSAGE (#295) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Becomes Act No. 281 |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022. |
2022-06-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2022-06-05 | Senate | Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. |
2022-06-03 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2022-06-03 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-02 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-25 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2022-05-19 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-18 | House | Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-04-20 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-19 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |