LA SB146 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
Pending: House Administration of Criminal Justice Committee
Hearing: May 21 @ 9:00 am in Room 6
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Limits the incarceration of victims of domestic violence and sex offenses who refuse to testify against their abusers. (gov sig)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits the incarceration of victims of domestic violence and sex offenses who refuse to testify against their abusers. (gov sig)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#304) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
2019-05-09HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2019-05-08SenateSenate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2019-05-08SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2019-04-23SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2019-04-17SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2019-04-16SenateReported with amendments.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
2019-03-27SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback