LA SB141 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date 6/10/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the temporary placement of video poker devices.
Title
Provides relative to the temporary placement of video poker devices.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Brown [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on SB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#527) (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 141 FINAL PASSAGE (#99) (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | Effective date 6/10/2013. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 216. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 61, nays 29. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 21, 2013. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-04-22 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 21 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |