LA SB139 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Effective date 6/12/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to fines levied by the commissioner of conservation for certain violations. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (gov sig)
Title
Provides relative to fines levied by the commissioner of conservation for certain violations. (2/3 - CA7s2.1(A)) (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 139 CONCUR (#972) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#499) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - House - House Vote on SB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#499) (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 139 FINAL PASSAGE (#283) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Senate | Effective date 6/12/2013. |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 367. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2013-05-20 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-05-16 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-15 | House | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2013-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |