LA SB132 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-09 - Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 476.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance coverage for temporal mandibular joint disorders. (8/1/16) (OR +$154,000 GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires health insurance coverage for temporal mandibular joint disorders. (8/1/16) (OR +$154,000 GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | Senate | Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 476. |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported by substitute. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |