LA SB131 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-02 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public postsecondary education boards and institutions to adopt policies to acceptable use of computers and internet services. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Requires public postsecondary education boards and institutions to adopt policies to acceptable use of computers and internet services. (gov sig) (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 131 FINAL PASSAGE (#405) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-04-28 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |