LA SB130 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - Involuntarily deferred in committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for liberative prescription. (gov sig)
Title
Provides for liberative prescription. (gov sig)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 130 FINAL PASSAGE (#496) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | House | Involuntarily deferred in committee. |
2022-05-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2022-05-10 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |