LA SB115 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits possession of firearms, ammunition, or electric weapons or devices by certain felons. (8/1/21)
Title
Prohibits possession of firearms, ammunition, or electric weapons or devices by certain felons. (8/1/21)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 115 FINAL PASSAGE (#208) (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 17 nays. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |