LA SB103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-07 - Effective date 8/1/12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the number of hours required to earn a baccalaureate degree. (8/1/12) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Limits the number of hours required to earn a baccalaureate degree. (8/1/12) (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 103, FINAL PASSAGE (#1300) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 103, FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 103, FINAL PASSAGE (#153) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-07 | Effective date 8/1/12. | |
2012-06-07 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 622. | |
2012-06-01 | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. | |
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-05-31 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-05-30 | Received from the House without amendments. | |
2012-05-30 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-24 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2012. | |
2012-05-21 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-17 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. | |
2012-05-16 | Reported favorably (12-0) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-03-29 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-03-28 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules | |
2012-03-28 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-03-27 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-03-26 | Reported with amendments. | |
2012-03-12 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2012-02-22 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |