LA HSR6 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Approved on 5/24/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression
Action: 2024-05-24 - Approved on 5/24/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requests a study of compensation for owners of stranded minerals
Title
Requests a study of compensation for owners of stranded minerals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Approved on 5/24/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 5/21/2024. |
2024-05-10 | House | Received on 5/10/2024. |