LA HSR1 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Approved on 6/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Approved on 6/16/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a study of the feasibility and practicality of using the Department of Insurance building location to provide for legislative apartments and offices
Title
Requires a study of the feasibility and practicality of using the Department of Insurance building location to provide for legislative apartments and offices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Approved on 6/16/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Study request list distributed to members on 6/11/2020. |
2020-06-11 | House | Received on 6/10/2020. |