LA HR71 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes May 6, 2021, as Literacy Day at the state capitol
Title
Recognizes May 6, 2021, as Literacy Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-05-13 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-05-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |