LA HR53 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 12, 2022, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol
Title
Designates April 12, 2022, as Acadiana Red and White Day at the state capitol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-04-11 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-04-07 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |