LA HR36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-01 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Invites Major League Baseball to consider locating a franchise in the New Orleans area on a temporary basis if the team is unable to play games in its home stadium due to COVID-19 restrictions
Title
Invites Major League Baseball to consider locating a franchise in the New Orleans area on a temporary basis if the team is unable to play games in its home stadium due to COVID-19 restrictions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-01 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2020-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2020-05-18 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted. |
2020-05-15 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |