LA HR246 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-31 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health, through its Medical Care Advisory Committee, or the creation of a subcommittee thereof, to study ways for Medicaid to invest in community-based social service organizations that address health-related social needs and determinants
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health, through its Medical Care Advisory Committee, or the creation of a subcommittee thereof, to study ways for Medicaid to invest in community-based social service organizations that address health-related social needs and determinants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - House - House Vote on HR 246 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1399) (Y: 75 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-31 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2024-05-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-05-28 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 75, nays 24. The resolution was adopted. |
2024-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2024. |
2024-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-05-20 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |