LA HR208 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Insurance to establish a task force to make recommendations for proposed legislation to address the issue of balance billing in Louisiana
Title
Requests the Department of Insurance to establish a task force to make recommendations for proposed legislation to address the issue of balance billing in Louisiana
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House Vote on HR 208 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1160) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2018-05-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2018-05-16 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2018-05-14 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. |