LA HR206 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges and requests the Louisiana Workforce Commission to study and make recommendations concerning the payment model for vocational rehabilitation services
Title
Urges and requests the Louisiana Workforce Commission to study and make recommendations concerning the payment model for vocational rehabilitation services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 206 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1658) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2022-05-26 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |