LA HR175 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana School Boards Association and the Louisiana Association of Public Charter Schools to study and report relative to the local cost of standardized testing associated with state assessments
Title
Requests the Louisiana School Boards Association and the Louisiana Association of Public Charter Schools to study and report relative to the local cost of standardized testing associated with state assessments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-06 - House - House Vote on HR 175 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1618) (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2022-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 85, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2022. |
2022-05-31 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-31 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2022-05-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |