LA HR113 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a special commission to study and make recommendations concerning medical marijuana laws and regulations
Title
Creates a special commission to study and make recommendations concerning medical marijuana laws and regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House Vote on HR 113 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1033) (Y: 61 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2021-06-08 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 61, nays 24. The resolution was adopted. |
2021-06-07 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-06-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. |
2021-06-03 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-06-02 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2021-05-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-20 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |