LA HR1 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Approves the annual integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2018, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Title
Approves the annual integrated coastal protection plan for Fiscal Year 2018, as adopted by the Coastal Protection and Restoration Authority Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - House - House Vote on HR 1 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#651) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2017-06-04 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. |
2017-06-02 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-02 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17. |
2017-05-24 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-05-23 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2017-05-22 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-05-18 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2017-05-18 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-04-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2017-03-31 | House | Prefiled. |