LA HCR79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections to study alternative means of reporting to a probation and parole officer
Title
Requests the Dept. of Public Safety and Corrections to study alternative means of reporting to a probation and parole officer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 79 ADOPT (#717) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 79 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#603) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - House - House Vote on HCR 79 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#603) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2019-06-03 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2019-06-02 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2019-06-01 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-05-28 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2019-05-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19. |
2019-05-22 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (13-0-1). |
2019-05-14 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2019-05-13 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |