LA HCR64 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group to study and make recommendations to the legislature concerning matters relating to licensure and regulation of emergency medical personnel
Title
Creates the Emergency Medical Services Professional Working Group to study and make recommendations to the legislature concerning matters relating to licensure and regulation of emergency medical personnel
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 64 ADOPT (#1283) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 64 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#917) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House Vote on HCR 64 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#917) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-22 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2018-05-17 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-05-10 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18. |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2018-04-25 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |