LA HCR60 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-15 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Public Access to Waterways Task Force
Title
Establishes the Public Access to Waterways Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - House - House Vote on HCR 60 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1009) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2018-05-14 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-11 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/18. |
2018-05-09 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2018-05-08 | House | Reported favorably (7-0). |
2018-05-02 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2018-04-24 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. |
2018-04-23 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |