LA HCR51 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Tabled by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calls for a convention to amend the United States Constitution to establish a limitation on terms for members of congress

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 51 LAY ON THE TABLE (#769) (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Vote on HCR 51 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#628) (Y: 66 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-03SenateTabled by a vote of 21 yeas and 13 nays. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2021-06-03SenateRules suspended.
2021-06-02SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2021-05-25SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
2021-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
2021-05-24HouseRead by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 23. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-20HouseScheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
2021-05-13HouseRead by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
2021-05-12HouseReported favorably (8-2-1).
2021-04-29HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
2021-04-28HouseRead by title. Lies over under the rules.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback