LA HCR48 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for House and Senate standing committees to meet and function as joint committees to study the provisions of the state constitution and to make recommendations for revisions
Title
Provides for House and Senate standing committees to meet and function as joint committees to study the provisions of the state constitution and to make recommendations for revisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Ivey [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House Vote on HCR 48 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#838) (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-05-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2022-05-16 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 83, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-05 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022. |
2022-05-05 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2022-05-04 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2022-04-05 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |
2022-04-04 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |