LA HCR217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Congressional Delegation to urge the secretary for the United States Army to allow the burial of a national guardsman at Arlington National Cemetery
Title
Requests the Louisiana Congressional Delegation to urge the secretary for the United States Army to allow the burial of a national guardsman at Arlington National Cemetery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 217 ADOPT (#651) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2015-06-07 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2015-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2015-06-02 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |