LA HCR198 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-27 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the partnership between Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. and the Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans
Title
Commends the partnership between Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. and the Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 198, ADOPT (#956) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-27 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2011-06-22 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2011-06-22 | Read by title, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |