LA HCR17 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-26 - Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the re-basing of nursing homes (EG +$24,105,951 SD EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the re-basing of nursing homes (EG +$24,105,951 SD EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-26 - House - House Vote on HCR 17 FINAL CONSIDERATION (#428) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2020-05-26 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 62, nays 35. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2020-05-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Made Special Order of the day No. 6 for 05/26/20. |
2020-05-21 | House | Reported favorably (21-0). |
2020-03-16 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2020-03-12 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |