LA HCR152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-18 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs public postsecondary education management boards and the Board of Regents to publish certain performance and cost data relative to public postsecondary education in La.
Title
Directs public postsecondary education management boards and the Board of Regents to publish certain performance and cost data relative to public postsecondary education in La.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 152, ADOPT (#1397) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HCR 152, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1280) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Vote on HCR 152, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1280) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-18 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | |
2010-06-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2010-06-14 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | |
2010-06-11 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | |
2010-06-11 | Rules suspended | |
2010-06-10 | Reported favorably. | |
2010-06-09 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-06-09 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | |
2010-06-04 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/9/2010. | |
2010-06-04 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | |
2010-06-03 | Reported favorably (13-0). | |
2010-05-06 | Read by title, referred to the Committee on Education. | |
2010-05-05 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |